TN HB1107 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that personally identifying information contained in motor vehicle accident reports be treated as confidential information and restricted from public disclosure. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38; Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that personally identifying information contained in motor vehicle accident reports be treated as confidential information and restricted from public disclosure. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38; Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 111
2019-04-01HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-03-05HouseAction Def. in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee to 3/12/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1346 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 111

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback