TN HB1105 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires nonpartisan elections for chancellors, circuit court judges, criminal court judges, and judges of any other state trial court of record. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2 and Title 17, relative to elections for judges of courts of record.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1665 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee