TN HB1102 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends eligibility for expunction to a person convicted of Class A misdemeanor assault prior to July 1, 2000. - Amends TCA Section 40-32-101 and Section 40-35-313.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 40-32-101 and Section 40-35-313, relative to expunction.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] |
Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 494 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0707 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021