TN HB1102 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, under certain circumstances, allows motorcycles to operate between lanes of traffic. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, under certain circumstances, allows motorcycles to operate between lanes of traffic. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2015-02-23HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2015-02-18HouseP1C.
2015-02-12HouseIntro.
2015-02-12HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1281 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback