TN HB1102 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes psychologists licensed in this state to provide impairment ratings for mental injuries in workers' compensation cases; creates certain penalties for noncompliance of certain workers' compensation coverage by construction services providers. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, authorizes psychologists licensed in this state to provide impairment ratings for mental injuries in workers' compensation cases; creates certain penalties for noncompliance of certain workers' compensation coverage by construction services providers. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Odom [D] | Sen. Reginald Tate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2013-02-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1364 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1102&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1102.pdf |