TN HB1099 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Marijuana Regulation Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41, Chapter 1, Part 1; Title 43; Title 45; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 12.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41, Chapter 1, Part 1; Title 43; Title 45; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 12, relative to the Tennessee Marijuana Regulation Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0697 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee