TN HB1099 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases from 30 to 25 the number of days in which an agency must establish a hearing date and set the case on the docket after a written claim is filed by a person asserting a claim to property seized under a forfeiture warrant. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As introduced, decreases from 30 to 25 the number of days in which an agency must establish a hearing date and set the case on the docket after a written claim is filed by a person asserting a claim to property seized under a forfeiture warrant. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1020 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee