TN HB1095 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a brief summary of any question, regardless of length, submitted to the people for a vote. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires a brief summary of any question, regardless of length, submitted to the people for a vote. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1017 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee