TN HB1094 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Def. to Summer Study in Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds the senate judiciary committee and criminal justice committee of the house of representatives to the legislative committees to which the commission must report actions taken on permits, licenses, and fees to be assessed following the promulgation of the proposed rules. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 8; Title 69 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 4; Title 8; Title 69 and Title 70, relative to the Tennessee fish and wildlife commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseDef. to Summer Study in Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
2021-03-02HouseAction Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/16/2021
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseRef to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee -- Government Operations for Review
2021-02-22HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0999 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback