TN HB1094 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits constables who have law enforcement powers to carry firearms at all times and in all places in Tennessee that other law enforcement officers are permitted to carry firearms; requires the constable to receive, at a minimum, 40 hours initial training, within one year of election, and eight hours annual in-service training in firearms qualification administered by a certified law enforcement firearms instructor. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 10 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, permits constables who have law enforcement powers to carry firearms at all times and in all places in Tennessee that other law enforcement officers are permitted to carry firearms; requires the constable to receive, at a minimum, 40 hours initial training, within one year of election, and eight hours annual in-service training in firearms qualification administered by a certified law enforcement firearms instructor. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 10 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 746 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2016 | |
2016-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-28 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA2 Ayes 61, Nays 25 PNV 5 HB1094 |
2016-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0785) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0368) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0261) |
2015-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1008 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 746