TN HB1090 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, defines "trailer" for purposes of the length restriction on buses operating with trailers attached. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 7, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, defines "trailer" for purposes of the length restriction on buses operating with trailers attached. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 7, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseAction Def. in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1498 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Enrolled and ready for signatures

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback