TN HB1088 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the prohibition on operating a needle and hypodermic syringe exchange program within 1,000 feet of a public park in certain counties and municipalities. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, relative to needle and hypodermic syringe exchange programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2021-04-21 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Health Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1179 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.