TN HB1087 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Failed In s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Failed In s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows teachers evaluated as "meeting expectations" to be eligible for tenure on the same basis as those teachers evaluated as "above expectations" and "significantly above expectations." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, allows teachers evaluated as "meeting expectations" to be eligible for tenure on the same basis as those teachers evaluated as "above expectations" and "significantly above expectations." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Failed In s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1206 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.