TN HB1079 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, establishes requirements for person or organization that has not been designated by the county election commission to conduct supplemental voter registration drives that attempts to register 100 or more people to vote; revises and adds various provisions governing elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, establishes requirements for person or organization that has not been designated by the county election commission to conduct supplemental voter registration drives that attempts to register 100 or more people to vote; revises and adds various provisions governing elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 3 AND 9 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Previous Question as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO DEFER AMENDMENT # 6 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Pub. Ch. 250
2019-05-09 Effective date(s) 10/01/2019
2019-05-02 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-30HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-29HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 3 & 9 Ayes 72, Nays 25 PNV 1 HB1079
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/29/19
2019-04-25SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 6
2019-04-25SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 6 - SA0365)
2019-04-25SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - SA0346)
2019-04-25SenateAmendment tabled (Amendment 4 - SA0345)
2019-04-25SenateAmendment tabled (Amendment 8 - SA0394)
2019-04-25SenateAmendment tabled (Amendment 7 -SA0393)
2019-04-25SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 9 - SA0412)
2019-04-25SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0260)
2019-04-25SenateAmendment withdrawn. ( Amendment 2 SA-0259)
2019-04-25SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0258)
2019-04-25SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-17SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 26, PNV 0
2019-04-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 8 - HA0363)
2019-04-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0285)
2019-04-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0284)
2019-04-15HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 7 - HA0361)
2019-04-15HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 6 - HA0360)
2019-04-15HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA0359)
2019-04-15HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA0358)
2019-04-15HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA0355)
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseRef. to Local Committee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0971 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 250

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1079&ga=111
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB1079.pdf
Texthttp://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/111/pub/pc0250.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0284.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0285.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0355.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0358.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0359.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0360.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0361.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA0363.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/SB0971.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1106.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1160.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1346.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1347.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1348.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1345.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1350.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1079&ga=111

Bill Comments

feedback