TN HB1079 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 209
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 209
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes the jury coordinator law applicable to Rhea and Morgan counties, which were previously excluded from such law. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Title
As enacted, makes the jury coordinator law applicable to Rhea and Morgan counties, which were previously excluded from such law. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 209 | |
2011-05-05 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-04-28 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/5/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Re-referred To: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to s/c Judiciary Subcommittee | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1213 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 209