TN HB1077 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a farmers market food unit permit for food service establishments that meet requirements. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 43; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 43; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to food that is available for consumption at farmers markets.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Brock Martin [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. Michael Hale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 475 | |
2023-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1049 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2023, 01/01/2024