TN HB1077 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing convenient voting centers pilot projects. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing convenient voting centers pilot projects. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] |
Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 445 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-01 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 83, Nays 8 PNV 3 HB1077 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 3 for 5/1/19 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0261) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 9, PNV 3 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0279) |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0727 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 445