TN HB1076 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the one-year experience requirement for doctorate level physical therapists for purposes of the direct access practice exception; requires physical therapists without a doctorate to meet certain educational requirements for purposes of the direct access practice exception. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, Chapter 13, relative to physical therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 130 | |
2021-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. SB584 |
2021-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/21 |
2021-03-22 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0584 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021