TN HB1076 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes an emergency communications district to purchase, in lieu of surety bonds, fidelity bonds to cover any losses from breach of the condition of faithful discharge of the duties of any board member, executive committee member, employee, officer, or any other authorized person of an emergency communications district who receives public funds, has authority to make expenditures from public funds, or has access to any public funds. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 8.
Title
As enacted, authorizes an emergency communications district to purchase, in lieu of surety bonds, fidelity bonds to cover any losses from breach of the condition of faithful discharge of the duties of any board member, executive committee member, employee, officer, or any other authorized person of an emergency communications district who receives public funds, has authority to make expenditures from public funds, or has access to any public funds. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418 | |
2017-05-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to next Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0970 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 418