TN HB1074 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing wineries and their satellite facilities and the transport of products. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-207.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing wineries and their satellite facilities and the transport of products. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-207.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 74 | |
2019-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1353 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 74