TN HB1069 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes TRICOR to sell goods manufactured by inmates to government entities, private nonprofit corporations, and charitable organizations in this state if the TRICOR board determines the sale is in the best interests of the state and does not unfairly compete with private sector businesses. - Amends TCA Section 41-22-116.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 41-22-116, relative to goods manufactured by inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 338 | |
2021-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0343) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-03-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0076) |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0590 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 338