TN HB1068 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, renames the "direct shipper's license" to be "winery direct shipper's license". - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As enacted, renames the "direct shipper's license" to be "winery direct shipper's license". - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263 | |
2019-04-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0536 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 263