TN HB1064 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that, unless certain circumstances are met, a landlord is not liable for negligence in renting, leasing, or otherwise extending housing opportunities to a person who has been previously convicted of a criminal offense based solely on the person's criminal conviction; specifies that evidence of the prior criminal conviction is not admissible. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 12; Title 40; Title 41, Chapter 4; Title 41, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 11; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 55, Chapter 50 and Section 62-76-104.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 12; Title 40; Title 41, Chapter 4; Title 41, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 11; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 55, Chapter 50 and Section 62-76-104, relative to offender reentry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 298 | |
2021-04-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0255) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 10, PNV 3 |
2021-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0158) |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0803 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 298