TN HB1063 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Rebound Act" to address recidivism of probationers and parolees. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 1; Title 16, Chapter 22; Title 16, Chapter 3; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 1; Title 16, Chapter 22; Title 16, Chapter 3; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to alternatives to incarceration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0802 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee