TN HB1063 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a student to be excused from a school athletic event if the event occurs on an official school holiday, observed day of worship, or religious holiday and the parent or legal guardian provides prior written notice of the student's absence; authorizes an unforeseen emergency as exception to the parent or legal guardian providing prior written notice of the student's absence from the athletic event. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1002.
Title
As enacted, allows a student to be excused from a school athletic event if the event occurs on an official school holiday, observed day of worship, or religious holiday and the parent or legal guardian provides prior written notice of the student's absence; authorizes an unforeseen emergency as exception to the parent or legal guardian providing prior written notice of the student's absence from the athletic event. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1002.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 260 | |
2017-04-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1012 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 260