TN HB1062 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes requirements for the location of outdoor advertising devices along an interstate or highway. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 21.
Title
As enacted, establishes requirements for the location of outdoor advertising devices along an interstate or highway. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 21.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 398 | |
2017-05-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0526 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 398