TN HB1059 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on diapers. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on diapers. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0964 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee