TN HB1050 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Failed in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the governor to expand medicaid pursuant to the Affordable Care Act; authorizes the governor to negotiate with the centers for medicare and medicaid services to determine the terms of the expansion. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the governor to expand medicaid pursuant to the Affordable Care Act; authorizes the governor to negotiate with the centers for medicare and medicaid services to determine the terms of the expansion. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseFailed in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0464 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback