TN HB1049 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Choice & Opportunity Scholarship Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Choice & Opportunity Scholarship Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Billy Spivey [R] |
Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] |
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] |
Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Charles Sargent [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] |
Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO DEFER (Y: 51 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Held on desk. |
2016-02-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/11/2016 |
2016-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2016-02-08 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2016-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/8/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2016-01-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-20 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 1/26/2016 |
2016-01-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 1/20/2016 |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2015-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2015-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning--Government Operations for review |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0999 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-22 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.