TN HB1047 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes to zero to three courts, including adding five additional courts, extending such courts to January 1, 2025, and allowing such courts to reinstate a revoked or suspended driver license of a party to an action before the court and waive unpaid fines and fees based on the party's satisfactory progress toward meeting the goals of the court. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 36; Title 37 and Chapter 366 of the Public Acts of 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes various changes to zero to three courts, including adding five additional courts, extending such courts to January 1, 2025, and allowing such courts to reinstate a revoked or suspended driver license of a party to an action before the court and waive unpaid fines and fees based on the party's satisfactory progress toward meeting the goals of the court. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 36; Title 37 and Chapter 366 of the Public Acts of 2017.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 383
2019-04-30HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-04-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-19HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0649 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 383

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback