TN HB1041 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a sentencing enhancement factor for defendants who are illegally or unlawfully in the United States. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As enacted, establishes a sentencing enhancement factor for defendants who are illegally or unlawfully in the United States. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 67 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Pub. Ch. 492 | |
2017-06-14 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-10 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 67, Nays 13 PNV 1 HB1041 |
2017-05-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/10/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 3 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0240) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-05-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 66, Nays 17, PNV 1 |
2017-05-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0384) |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1260 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 492