TN HB1038 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a covered employer under the drug-free workplace program to provide a written copy of the employer's policy on a drug-free workplace to an employee at the employee's request. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a covered employer under the drug-free workplace program to provide a written copy of the employer's policy on a drug-free workplace to an employee at the employee's request. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-19HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseRef. to State Committee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1343 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback