TN HB1035 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 423
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 423
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state board of education to implement a process whereby the set of standards known as the Common Core State Standards adopted in 2010 will be reviewed and replaced with new sets of standards; requires the state board of education or the department of education to cancel any memorandum of understanding concerning the Common Core State Standards entered into with the national governor's association and the council of chief state school officers; establishes advisory teams and a standards recommendation committee; revises other provisions regarding curriculum standards. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires the state board of education to implement a process whereby the set of standards known as the Common Core State Standards adopted in 2010 will be reviewed and replaced with new sets of standards; requires the state board of education or the department of education to cancel any memorandum of understanding concerning the Common Core State Standards entered into with the national governor's association and the council of chief state school officers; establishes advisory teams and a standards recommendation committee; revises other provisions regarding curriculum standards. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Pub. Ch. 423 | |
2015-05-20 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2015 | |
2015-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0158) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0157) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0481) |
2015-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0441) |
2015-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0187) |
2015-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0186) |
2015-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Sponsor change. |
2015-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1163 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 423