TN HB1032 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the Tennessee higher education commission may submit its annual report on the condition of Tennessee higher education to the governor and the general assembly in an electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the Tennessee higher education commission may submit its annual report on the condition of Tennessee higher education to the governor and the general assembly in an electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2018 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0984 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee