TN HB1029 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Human Life Protection Act," which bans abortion in this state effective on the 30th day after the U.S. Supreme Court overturns Roe v. Wade or an amendment to the U.S. Constitution to allow states to prohibit abortion; creates exception for situations where the abortion is necessary to prevent the death of pregnant woman or prevent serious risk of substantial and irreversible impairment of major bodily function; prohibits prosecution of a woman upon whom an abortion is performed or attempted. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-5116; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 9; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 68 and Title 71, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Human Life Protection Act," which bans abortion in this state effective on the 30th day after the U.S. Supreme Court overturns Roe v. Wade or an amendment to the U.S. Constitution to allow states to prohibit abortion; creates exception for situations where the abortion is necessary to prevent the death of pregnant woman or prevent serious risk of substantial and irreversible impairment of major bodily function; prohibits prosecution of a woman upon whom an abortion is performed or attempted. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-5116; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 9; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 68 and Title 71, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 351
2019-04-22HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-10HouseRecalled from Subcommittee Pursuant to Rule 83 (13)
2019-03-27HouseFailed in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-02-20HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1257 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 351

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback