TN HB1027 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the Tennessee medical examiner advisory council from its wind down period so it will not terminate on June 30, 2017; extends council to June 30, 2019; renames and restructures the council. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 38, Chapter 7, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, removes the Tennessee medical examiner advisory council from its wind down period so it will not terminate on June 30, 2017; extends council to June 30, 2019; renames and restructures the council. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 38, Chapter 7, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 444 | |
2017-05-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1016 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-30 - Pub. Ch. 444