TN HB1025 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the time within which a sentencing hearing must be held from within 45 days after a finding of guilt to within 30 days after the finding of guilt. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 55, relative to sentencing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseRef. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-22HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0908 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback