TN HB1020 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the judges at a polling place to hand count and record the number of ballots counted and compare such number with the tally sheets after the polling place is closed. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/22/2023
2023-03-15HouseReset on Final cal. of Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2023-03-15HouseDef. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/15/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1094 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee - no second

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback