TN HB1016 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires students to pass a civics test to receive a full diploma upon graduation from high school; requires LEAs to include all 100 questions from the United States civics test, instead of only 25 to 50 questions, on the civics test prepared by the LEA; increases from 70 to 75 the percentage of questions a student must correctly answer to pass the civics test. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires students to pass a civics test to receive a full diploma upon graduation from high school; requires LEAs to include all 100 questions from the United States civics test, instead of only 25 to 50 questions, on the civics test prepared by the LEA; increases from 70 to 75 the percentage of questions a student must correctly answer to pass the civics test. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - HOUSE CURRICULUM, TESTING, & INNOVATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-06HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-01HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 77, Nays 6 PNV 0 HB1016
2019-04-30HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-04-30SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0388)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 77, Nays 15, PNV 3
2019-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0379)
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/10/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1243 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback