TN HB1016 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the rules of the road requiring drivers to yield the right-of-way at intersections and other locations to the operation of vehicles on drives open to public use and frequented by the public at large. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, extends the rules of the road requiring drivers to yield the right-of-way at intersections and other locations to the operation of vehicles on drives open to public use and frequented by the public at large. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 79 | |
2015-03-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1046 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 79
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1016&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1016.pdf |