TN HB1015 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the chief executive officer or the plan administrator to transmit a report on the actuarial and financial status of the retirement plan in effect for employees of the local government unit in an electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 9; Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 7; Title 8; Title 12 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the chief executive officer or the plan administrator to transmit a report on the actuarial and financial status of the retirement plan in effect for employees of the local government unit in an electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 9; Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 7; Title 8; Title 12 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1121 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1015&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1015.pdf |