TN HB1013 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, clarifies that a sheriff and sheriff's deputy are law enforcement officers for purposes of the criminal code; clarifies that a deputy jailer is a law enforcement officer only for the purposes of enhancement of a crime under the criminal code. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38 and Title 39, relative to criminal offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-18 Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
2023-05-18 Pub. Ch. 365
2023-05-05 Signed by Governor.
2023-04-28HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-04-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-21HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-18HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-04-17SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 7
2023-04-17SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2023-04-05SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2023-04-04HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-04-03HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 4
2023-03-30HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/3/2023
2023-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023
2023-03-28HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-03-06HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-03-06HouseRef. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1491 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 365

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback