TN HB1012 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the secretary of state, in collaboration with the comptroller of the treasury, to study the economic impact of sports gaming in this state if such activity was legalized, and in other states where sports gaming is currently legal; requires the secretary of the state and the comptroller to jointly report the findings to the general assembly by January 15, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 28; Title 29; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the secretary of state, in collaboration with the comptroller of the treasury, to study the economic impact of sports gaming in this state if such activity was legalized, and in other states where sports gaming is currently legal; requires the secretary of the state and the comptroller to jointly report the findings to the general assembly by January 15, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 28; Title 29; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1463 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback