TN HB1011 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes electronic submission of the annual report on distribution and abuse of controlled substances from the commissioner of health to the health committees of the senate and the house of representatives under the Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, authorizes electronic submission of the annual report on distribution and abuse of controlled substances from the commissioner of health to the health committees of the senate and the house of representatives under the Tennessee Prescription Safety Act of 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] |
Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2019-04-01 | House | R/S Ref. to Health Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0572 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2020