TN HB1010 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes restrictions on coverage of off-label drugs by insurers; removes definitions of medical literature and standard reference compendia. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes restrictions on coverage of off-label drugs by insurers; removes definitions of medical literature and standard reference compendia. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09HouseAction def. in Insurance Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-03-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-28HouseReassigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-03-06HouseRef. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1215 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback