TN HB1009 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires commissioner of revenue to report in writing to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives the total annual amount of industrial machinery franchise and excise tax credits for fiscal years 2016-2021. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21, relative to franchise and excise taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 5/4/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0375 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee