TN HB1008 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the maximum percentage of the sentence imposed by the court that can be reduced by sentence credits from 15 percent to 35 percent for certain offenses and makes other related changes. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to release eligibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0966 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee