TN HB1007 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 29.0141 percent to 28.5262 percent, the share of state sales and use tax revenue deposited to the state general fund; increases, from 4.6030 percent to 5.0909 percent, the share appropriated to municipalities. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-103.
Title
As introduced, reduces, from 29.0141 percent to 28.5262 percent, the share of state sales and use tax revenue deposited to the state general fund; increases, from 4.6030 percent to 5.0909 percent, the share appropriated to municipalities. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-103.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1158 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation