TN HB1006 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the unruly act of illegal use of a communication device by a minor to include possessing or transmitting an image of sexual activity involving a minor. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 10, relative to children.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 147 | |
2021-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1124 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021