TN HB1002 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the monthly allotment of temporary cash assistance awarded to each recipient in the Families First program to be increased from the 2021 level to $380 by January 1, 2022, subject to appropriation of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9 and Title 71, relative to temporary assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0104 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee